Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal González de Mendoza

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1428Born
28 Nov 145325.5AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Jul 145426.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
30 Oct 146739.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
7 May 147345.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 147345.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica
9 May 147446.0AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
6 Jul 147850.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
8 Jul 148254.1AppointedAdministrator of Osma, Spain
13 Nov 148254.5AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
13 Nov 148254.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
11 Jan 149566.6DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González de Mendoza
Pedro Cardinal González de Mendoza (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara
Death PlaceGuadalajara

  • a bishop for 40.4 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 114, and Page 235
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 252, and Page 165
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,994
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 307, Number 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1454, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast