Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pablo García Abella, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1776BornMadrid
8 Mar 180024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
17 Sep 182751.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
17 Sep 182751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
9 Dec 182751.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
18 Dec 183256.8SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
15 Apr 183357.1ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
2 Jan 184871.8SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
17 Jan 184871.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
16 Jul 184872.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
6 Aug 186084.4DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo García Abella:
Archbishop Pablo García Abella C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 578
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 125, and Page 369
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 145, Number 789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013