Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Hidalgo Ibáñez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1902Born
25 Jul 192623.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 195048.0AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
4 Mar 195148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
31 Jan 197875.3RetiredBishop of Jaca, Spain
17 Mar 198481.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ángel Hidalgo Ibáñez
Bishop Ángel Hidalgo Ibáñez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNájera

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast