Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Búa Otero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1933BornIsla de Arosa
19 Mar 196127.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 198248.7AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
21 Feb 198248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
14 Sep 198956.4AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
15 Sep 200370.4ResignedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
21 Apr 201279.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Búa Otero:
Bishop Ramón Búa Otero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013