Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Castellanos de Villalba

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Mar 1513AppointedBishop of Elne, France
25 May 1515AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
23 Aug 1522DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Castellanos de Villalba
Bishop Juan Castellanos de Villalba (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Death PlaceLogroño

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 28, Number 95
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 145
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast