Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel San Román y Elena

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Titular Bishop of Mylasa

Apostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1865Born
11 Jun 189227.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 190843.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain
24 Jul 190843.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
17 Jan 190943.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
25 Jun 190944.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
28 Aug 191146.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel San Román y Elena
Bishop Manuel San Román y Elena (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCobreros de Sanabria
Ordained BishopCalahorra, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a priest for 19.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast