Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Tolosa, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tui, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1587²AppointedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1593²ResignedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
8 Jan 1597AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
5 Oct 1597Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
9 Sep 1600DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Tolosa
Bishop Francisco de Tolosa O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Tui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVizcaya, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Death PlaceTui, Diocese of Tui

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,365
  • bp/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 110, Number 698
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast