Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Lartaún

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1570AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
12 Aug 1571Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
9 Oct 1583DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Lartaún
Bishop Sebastián Lartaún (died ) Bishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVizcaya, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopOvarzun, Spain
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 81, Number 488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast