Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Salvatierra

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1578AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
23 Mar 1583AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
15 May 1591AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1604²DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Salvatierra
Bishop Martín de Salvatierra (died 1604) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitoria

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 90, Number 555
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100, and Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast