Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abilio del Campo y de la Bárcena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1908BornValdazo
30 May 193123.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 195244.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
29 Oct 195244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pionia
30 Nov 195244.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pionia
7 May 195345.2AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
20 Dec 197668.8ResignedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
2 Aug 198072.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain

MicroData Summary for Abilio del Campo y de la Bárcena:
Bishop Abilio del Campo y de la Bárcena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Oct 2014