Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de la Peña García de Ceniceros

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1592³BornValtierra
1617¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 165967.0AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
27 Aug 166371.4AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
23 May 166775.1DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de la Peña García de Ceniceros:
Bishop José de la Peña García de Ceniceros (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a priest for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 104, and Page 128
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 190, Number 1,196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 1 Apr 2015