Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Antonio Cardinal Guadagni, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1674BornFlorence
11 Mar 170227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
20 Dec 172450.2AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
31 Dec 172450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
24 Sep 173157.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 173157.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
4 Nov 173258.1ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
23 Feb 175075.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
12 Jan 175681.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
15 Jan 175984.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Guadagni (VIAF: 27055152)
Giovanni Antonio Cardinal Guadagni O.C.D. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
  • a cardinal for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1731
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1724, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016