Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Agostino Delbecchi, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1697BornOneglia
3 May 172124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
17 Mar 175153.9SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
17 May 175154.0ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
23 May 175154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
6 Jul 176366.2SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
18 Jul 176366.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 Apr 177779.9DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Agostino Delbecchi (VIAF: 88839927)
Archbishop Giuseppe Agostino Delbecchi Sch. P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 76, and Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016