Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacopo Gaetano Nicolò Inghirami

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1705Born
9 Apr 173529.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 175549.5AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
31 Mar 175549.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
20 May 177266.6DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jacopo Gaetano Nicolò Inghirami
Bishop Jacopo Gaetano Nicolò Inghirami (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolterra, Diocese of Volterra

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast