Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Brescia

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1693BornStilo
19 Mar 172531.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 174753.8AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
23 May 174753.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
2 Feb 176874.5DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Brescia:
Bishop Nicola Brescia (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013