Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Gaetani

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1697³Born
21 Mar 173335.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 174951.4AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
27 Apr 174951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
12 Jun 175456.5DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Gaetani
Bishop Benedetto Gaetani (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisa

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast