Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John MacDonald

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1727¹BornArdnamurchan, Argyllshire
18 Mar 175225.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Apr 175225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Feb 176134.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Feb 176134.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
27 Sep 176134.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
12 Mar 177346.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
9 May 177952.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John MacDonald
Bishop John MacDonald (born 1727, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Highland District

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 407, and Page 455
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016