Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Pitellia, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1694Born
22 May 171723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
15 Jul 174349.1AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
25 Jul 174349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
22 Sep 175258.3DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Pitellia
Bishop Isidoro Pitellia O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiumefreddo

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast