Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carlo Antonelli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1690BornVelletri
2 Apr 175261.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 175261.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 175261.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
15 May 175261.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
4 Jun 175261.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
1769¹78.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Antonelli: VIAF:17954195
Bishop Giovanni Carlo Antonelli (born , died 1769) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a priest for 16.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 197, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015