Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Filippo Incontri

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1677BornVolterra
24 Mar 170325.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Apr 170325.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 173456.4AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
16 May 173456.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
26 Jul 175375.6DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Filippo Incontri:
Bishop Carlo Filippo Incontri (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013