Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Venizza

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1715³Born
1 Apr 174125.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 175439.6AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
22 Dec 175439.6Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
7 Dec 177055.6DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Venizza
Bishop Angelo Maria Venizza (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà della Pieve

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast