Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Flavio Cardinal Chigi (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1631BornSiena, Italy
9 Apr 165725.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 165725.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
21 Jun 165928.1AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
28 Jul 166130.2AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
29 Nov 166130.5AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
166634.6AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
19 Sep 168150.3ResignedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
18 Mar 168654.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
24 Mar 168654.8Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
19 Oct 168958.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
13 Sep 169362.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Flavio Chigi (Sr.):
Flavio Cardinal Chigi (Sr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
  • a cardinal for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 2
  • c34: CB, 25 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015