Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus (Arcangelo) Bianchini, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1689BornScansano Sovana
24 Sep 170516.6ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
24 Sep 171223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
28 Nov 174657.8AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
4 Dec 174657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
22 May 175061.3DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus (Arcangelo) Bianchini:
Bishop Nicolaus (Arcangelo) Bianchini O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013