Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giustino Girolamo Bagnesi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1692BornFirenze
19 Sep 171624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 174856.3AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
21 Jul 174856.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
Jan 1775³82.8DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giustino Girolamo Bagnesi:
Bishop Giustino Girolamo Bagnesi O.S.B. (born , died Jan 1775) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 171
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015