Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Tria (II)

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1686Born
19 Dec 171024.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 174255.1AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
28 Jan 174255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
20 Aug 174760.7DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Tria (II)
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Tria (II) (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLatertiae

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,742, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast