Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Lanfreschi

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1691Born
23 Sep 171322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Feb 171422.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 173746.2AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
30 Jun 173746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
21 May 173847.1AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
8 Feb 175462.8DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lanfreschi
Archbishop Francesco Lanfreschi (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIschia

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 138
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast