Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Maria Franzesi

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1713BornMonte San Savino
21 Sep 173724.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175743.5AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
16 Jan 175743.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
7 Dec 179986.4DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Franzesi:
Bishop Pietro Maria Franzesi (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 296
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013