Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Guidi

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1694Born
27 Jun 172329.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 173338.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
25 Jan 173338.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
15 Feb 173439.8AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
Jul 1778³84.2DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Guidi
Archbishop Francesco Guidi (born , died Jul 1778) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolterra, Diocese of Volterra

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,733, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast