Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovicus Benzoni, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1677Born
18 Sep 170023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
22 Jul 173860.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
27 Jul 173860.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa

MicroData Summary for Ludovicus Benzoni
Bishop Ludovicus Benzoni O. Carm. (born ) Titular Bishop of Elusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast