Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Niccol˛ Cecina

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Volterra, Italy

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1692Born
21 Dec 1692Ordained DeaconDeacon of Volterra, Italy
27 Dec 1692Ordained PriestPriest of Volterra, Italy
15 Dec 175563.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Volterra, Italy
15 Dec 175563.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
21 Dec 175563.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
9 Jan 176572.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Niccol˛ Cecina
Bishop Filippo Niccol˛ Cecina (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolterra, Diocese of Volterra

  • a priest for 72.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 445, and Page 450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,755, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast