Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato Maria Arcangeli

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1709³BornArezzo
30 May 173324.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 174233.0AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
11 Mar 174233.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
26 Dec 177263.8DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donato Maria Arcangeli
Bishop Donato Maria Arcangeli (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 38
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762, Page 211
  • ob/c2: AT, 17 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 19 Mar 2016