Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominicus Laymo

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1677BornBisignanen
1 Apr 170224.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 173457.2AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
11 Jul 173457.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
Feb 176082.8DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dominicus Laymo:
Bishop Dominicus Laymo (born ) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013