Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Segherio Felice Seghieri

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1721Born
8 Oct 174726.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 175130.3AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
25 Jul 175130.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
27 Jul 175837.3DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

MicroData Summary for Segherio Felice Seghieri
Bishop Segherio Felice Seghieri (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecarlo Pescia

  • a priest for 10.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast