Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Filippo Carlo Spada

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1670³Born
23 Sep 170232.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 170232.3AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
30 Nov 170232.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
15 Feb 173867.5AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
19 Dec 173868.4ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
19 Dec 173868.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
8 Jan 174271.4ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
22 Jan 174271.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
8 Dec 174272.4DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Carlo Spada
Patriarch Filippo Carlo Spada (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto, Diocese of Spoleto, Italy
Ordained BishopSs. Incarnazione del Verbo divino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Carlo Chapel, Santa Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 315
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75, and Page 401
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 35
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 Aug 2020
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast