Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchiorre Delfico

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1694BornTeramo
23 Nov 171925.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 173843.4AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
11 May 173843.4Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
23 Apr 174449.4DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Melchiorre Delfico:
Bishop Melchiorre Delfico (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015