Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Ronchi

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1701Born
21 Dec 172625.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 173231.5AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
21 Dec 173231.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
9 Jan 176462.5DiedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ronchi
Bishop Carlo Ronchi (born , died ) Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast