Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Calvani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bertinoro

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1689³BornMassa
11 Apr 171626.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 173444.4AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
11 Apr 173444.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
19 Sep 174757.9ResignedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
20 Nov 174758.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
19 Feb 175767.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bertinoro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Calvani:
Archbishop Gaetano Calvani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bertinoro

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1741
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 130
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013