Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito Moio (Mojo)

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1693BornMarano
19 Sep 171623.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 174451.0AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
21 Jun 174451.0Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
11 Mar 176773.7DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito Moio (Mojo):
Bishop Vito Moio (Mojo) (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013