Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Marculli, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bitetto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1695Born
25 May 174246.5AppointedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
27 May 174246.5Ordained BishopBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
10 May 174549.4AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
6 Oct 177074.8DiedBishop of Bitetto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Marculli
Bishop Angelo Maria Marculli O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Bitetto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGravina

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123, and Page 167
  • c34: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast