Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ferro

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1683Born
24 Jun 170622.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 173855.4AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
28 Dec 173855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
27 May 174258.8DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ferro
Bishop Giovanni Ferro (born , died ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePettorazza Pappafava

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast