Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Christoph Bartholomäus Anton Cardinal Migazzi Von Waal Und Sonnenthurn

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1714BornTrento, Italy
7 Apr 173823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
31 Jul 175136.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
20 Sep 175136.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
20 Sep 175136.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
10 Oct 175136.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
18 Jul 175641.7ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
28 Aug 175641.8SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
20 Sep 175641.9ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
15 Mar 175742.4SelectedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
23 May 175742.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
23 Nov 176147.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Apr 177560.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
14 Apr 180388.4DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Christoph Bartholomäus Anton Migazzi Von Waal Und Sonnenthurn
Christoph Bartholomäus Anton Cardinal Migazzi Von Waal Und Sonnenthurn (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 51.5 years
  • a cardinal for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149, and Page 282
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 429, and Page 441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016