Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosimo Pierbenedetto Maculani, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1702BornCamerino
21 Dec 172624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
6 May 174845.4AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
12 May 174845.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
6 Oct 176764.9DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Pierbenedetto Maculani:
Bishop Cosimo Pierbenedetto Maculani C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015