Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Malvezzi Bonfioli

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1715Born
26 Nov 175338.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175338.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
14 Jan 175438.8AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
19 Mar 175439.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
3 Dec 177560.7DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Malvezzi Bonfioli (VIAF: 8591199)
Vincenzo Cardinal Malvezzi Bonfioli (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
  • a cardinal for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast