Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Cossovich

Deceased

Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1688³BornCattaro
8 Nov 171123.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 173446.2AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
8 Dec 173446.3Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
21 Jul 176172.9DiedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Cossovich:
Bishop Vincent Cossovich (born , died ) Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015