Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Fraccagnani

Deceased

Bishop of Cittą della Pieve


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1697BornGrotte a Mare
8 Mar 172123.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 173840.9AppointedBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
12 Oct 173841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
2 Apr 174850.5DiedBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Fraccagnani:
Bishop Gaetano Fraccagnani (born , died ) Bishop of Cittą della Pieve

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1746
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013