Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severino Antonio Missini

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1684Born
12 Apr 173247.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Apr 173247.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 173247.6AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
22 Jun 173247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
20 Jan 175368.2DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Severino Antonio Missini
Bishop Severino Antonio Missini (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrvieto

  • a priest for 20.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 135
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast