Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe de Vignoli

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1710Born
19 Sep 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 174635.8AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
19 Jun 174635.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
19 Dec 175747.3AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
14 Apr 175847.6InstalledBishop of Carpentras, France
5 Jul 177665.8ResignedBishop of Carpentras, France
15 Jul 177665.9AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
2 Apr 178271.6DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Vignoli
Bishop Giuseppe de Vignoli (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149, and Page 218
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 378
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,746, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast