Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Bozzatini

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1690BornPiove di Sacco
24 Sep 171222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 171323.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 174251.9AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
15 Jul 174251.9Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
9 Jul 175463.9DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marino Bozzatini:
Bishop Marino Bozzatini (born , died ) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015