Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Suares de la Concha

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1693BornFirenze
26 Jan 173541.2AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
30 Jan 173541.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
27 Oct 175461.0DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Suares de la Concha:
Bishop Giuseppe Suares de la Concha (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015