Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Grant

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Sinitis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1706³BornWester Boggs, Enzie
4 Apr 173326.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 175548.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Feb 175548.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinitis
13 Nov 175549.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinitis
21 Aug 176761.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
3 Dec 177872.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Grant:
Bishop James Grant (born Jul 1706, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 381, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015